Phifer v. Lopez et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Raner C Collins |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00346 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 08/29 9:42 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Timothy Scott Phifer. (5 pages)(SCA) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 08/01 2:16 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $55.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proced In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement (or institutional equivalent). If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $55.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). Signed by Senior District Judge Raner C Collins on 8/1/2024. (See attached Order for complete information.)(SCA) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Party)
Thu 08/01 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Timothy Scott Phifer: 1210 E Pennsylvania, Tucson, AZ 85714.(SCA) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 07/16 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 07/16 12:37 PM
*Re-docketed at Doc.4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC) *Modified to reflect this document was re-docketed to include attachments on 7/16/2024 (BAC) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 07/16 12:32 PM
*Re-docketed at Doc.4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (BAC) *Modified and re-docketed on 7/16/2024 to include Plaintiff's name on document. (BAC) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 12:31 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Timothy Scott Phifer. (4 pages)(BAC) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |