Yuan v. Eightfold AI Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Araceli Martinez-Olguin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04238 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:23-cv-12932 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 3:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Eightfold AI Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tanggang "Dan" Yuan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Dismiss
Fri 09/06 3:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Tanggang Dan Yuans Massachusetts State Law Claims for Failure to State a Claim filed by Eightfold AI Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 11/7/2024 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Responses due by 9/20/2024. Replies due by 9/27/2024.(Sharma, Puja) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Eightfold AI Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Tanggang Dan Yuans Massachusetts State Law Claims for Failure to State a Claim, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Gary J. Lieberman in Support of Defendant Eightfold AI Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Tanggang Dan Yuans Massachusetts State Law Claims for Failure to State a Claim, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Eightfold AI Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Tanggang Dan Yuans Massachusetts State Law Claims for Failure to State a Claim | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Fri 09/06 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Zachary Mayer on behalf of Tanggang "Dan" Yuan (Mayer, Zachary) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Fri 09/06 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Randall Allen Miller on behalf of Tanggang "Dan" Yuan (Miller, Randall) |
|
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/06 12:06 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gary J. Lieberman. (ads, COURT STAFF) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/06 8:42 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Gary J. Lieberman ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19697305.) Filing fee previously paid on 08/06/2024 filed by Eightfold AI Inc.. (Lieberman, Gary) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 08/26 4:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The Court reminds the parties that as a general matter, a party seeking an extension of a court deadline must seek an extension at least seven days prior to the deadline. See Civil Standing Order at 3. The Court will not grant any further administrative motions to extend the time to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on August 26, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc2, COURTSTAFF) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/23 1:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Eightfold AI Inc..(Sharma, Puja) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Eightfold AI Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Defendants Time to File a Responsive Pleading, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Puja Sharma in Support of Defendant Eightfold AI Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Defendant's Time to File a Responsive Pleading, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Eightfold AI Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Defendant's Time to File a Responsive Pleading, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 08/05 8:59 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleading . (ads, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 07/29 3:35 PM
Clerk's Notice on Reassignment. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] . Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2024 no later than 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) |
|
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/29 11:12 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
32 | 32
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 07/29 7:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/26 4:51 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eightfold AI Inc... (Sharma, Puja) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/26 4:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleading filed by Eightfold AI Inc..(Sharma, Puja) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Eightfold Ai Inc.s Motion to Enlarge Defendants Time to File a Responsive Pleading, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Puja Sharma in Support of Defendant Eightfold Ai Inc.s Motion to Enlarge Defendants Time to File a Responsive Pleading, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Eightfold Ai Inc.s Motion to Enlarge Defendants Time to File a Responsive Pleading | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 07/23 4:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Eightfold AI Inc. (Sharma, Puja) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/23 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Puja Sharma (Sharma, Puja) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 07/17 9:36 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 07/16 2:31 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ecg, COURT STAFF) |
|
25 | 25
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 07/16 2:25 PM
Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:23-cv-12932. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
24 | 24 Case transferred to to Northern District of California. Case file sent electronically to Clerk in that district. (McManus, Caetlin) | |
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
23 | 23 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered....For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that it is in the interest of justice to transfer this action to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. See 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a); Atl. Marine , 571 U.S. at 62. Defendant's Motion to Transfer, [ECF No.11 ]. is ALLOWED , and the Court hereby ORDERS that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. SO ORDERED. (McManus, Caetlin) | |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
22 | 22 First SUR-REPLY to Motion re11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to Northern District of California. Leave Granted 2/20/24 filed by Tanggang "Dan" Yuan. (Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) | |
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
21 | 21 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting20 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen) | |
20 | 20 First MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply -Unopposed by Tanggang "Dan" Yuan.(Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) | |
19 | 19 REPLY to Response to11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to Northern District of California. filed by Eightfold AI Inc.. (Lieberman, Gary) | |
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
18 | 18 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting17 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen) | |
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer (Unopposed) by Eightfold AI Inc..(Lieberman, Gary) | |
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
16 | 16 First Opposition re11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to Northern District of California. filed by Tanggang "Dan" Yuan. (Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) | |
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
15 | 15 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/31/24 to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Transfer. (Folan, Karen) | |
14 | 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/31/24 to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Tanggang "Dan" Yuan.(Kennedy-Smith, Samuel) | |
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 AFFIDAVIT of Roy Wang in Support re11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to Northern District of California. filed by Eightfold AI Inc..(Lieberman, Gary) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement | ||
12 | 12 10 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to Northern District of California. filed by Eightfold AI Inc.. (Lieberman, Gary) | |
11 | 11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to Northern District of California. by Eightfold AI Inc..(Lieberman, Gary) | |
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2024 to File Answer . Eightfold AI Inc. answer due 1/10/2024. (Folan, Karen) | |
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2024 to File Answer by Eightfold AI Inc..(Lynch, Matthew) | |
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 STATE COURT Record. (Lynch, Matthew) | |
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 22, 2023 to File Answer to Complaint. Eightfold AI Inc. answer due 12/22/2023. (McManus, Caetlin) | |
6 | 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 22, 2023 to File Answer by Eightfold AI Inc..(Lieberman, Gary) | |
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Kelly, Danielle) | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cook, Savannah) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary J. Lieberman on behalf of Eightfold AI Inc. (Lieberman, Gary) | |
2 | 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eightfold AI Inc.. (Lynch, Matthew) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eightfold AI Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10156547 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Lynch, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Category Form |