Tesla, Inc. v. Yancheng Jeco Auto Parts Co., Ltd
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard Seeborg |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04245 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 3:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Yancheng Jeco Auto Parts Co., Ltd
|
|
Plaintiff
Tesla, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
5
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 07/25 11:19 AM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING 8 STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE BY AGREEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF TESLA, INC. AND DEFENDANT YANCHENG JECO AUTO PARTS CO., LTD. (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 07/24 5:31 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Dorny, A.) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/16 1:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Yancheng Jeco Auto Parts Co., Ltd. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 07/16 1:42 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 07/16 12:17 PM
Proposed Summons. (Dorny, A.) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 07/16 10:59 AM
Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla, Inc. (Dorny, A.) | |
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tesla, Inc. (Dorny, A.) | |
1 | 1 24 pgs COMPLAINT against Yancheng Jeco Auto Parts Co., Ltd ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19619725.). Filed by Tesla, Inc..(Dorny, A.) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit "B", | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |