Goddard v. Rodriguez et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04259 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 3:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alameda County District Attorney's Office
|
|
Defendant
Alameda County Sheriff's Department
|
|
Defendant
Melanie Ditzenberger
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Gaidos
|
|
Defendant
Victor Rodriguez
|
|
Defendant
Margaret Roe
|
|
Defendant
Sameer Shukla
|
|
Defendant
Sierry Wilhelm
|
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Goddard
21055 NE 37th Ave., Apt. 1109
Aventura, FL 33180 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 08/19 7:25 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 08/16 8:46 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Fri 08/16 8:08 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. This case was originally filed in forma pauperis, and the court flagged the issue of the sufficiency of the affidavit. (ECF Nos. 2, 5.) The plaintiff then paid the filing fee and declined magistrate-judge jurisdiction. (ECF Nos. 6, 7.) The case thus is reassigned. Some context is provided in the OSC at ECF No. 5. (ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Mon 08/05 5:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Alameda County District Attorney's Office, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Melanie Ditzenberger, Matthew Gaidos, Victor Rodriguez, Margaret Roe, Sameer Shukla, Sierry Wilhelm. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 08/05 5:40 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 311169775. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Sun 07/28 9:56 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Goddard.(ecg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 07/23 11:32 AM
ORDER re: 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 07/22/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/16 3:59 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 07/16/2024.(ejk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Att: 1 Self Help Flyer, | ||
Att: 2 Pro Se Handbook | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 07/16 3:08 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 3:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Daniel Goddard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Alameda County District Attorney's Office, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Melanie Ditzenberger, Matthew Gaidos, Victor Rodriguez, Margaret Roe, Sameer Shukla, Sierry Wilhelm. Filed by Daniel Goddard. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2024.(mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |