C- v. Jaddou et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kandis A Westmore |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04225 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 3:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
DIRECTOR Emilia Bardini
|
|
Defendant
DIRECTOR Ur M Jaddou
USCIS 5900 Capital Gateway Dr
Camp Springs, MD 20588 |
|
Plaintiff
G- C-
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus
Thu 08/22 9:23 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 3 Motion for Writ of Mandamus to Proceed Under Pseudonym. (wft, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 07/31 9:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by G- C-. All Defendants. (Tunc, Erdogan) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/16 10:46 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by G- C-.. (Tunc, Erdogan) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/16 12:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Emilia Bardini, Ur M Jaddou. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order
Tue 07/16 12:48 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) | |
Saturday, July 13, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by G- C-. Responses due by 7/29/2024. Replies due by 8/5/2024.(Tunc, Erdogan) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Tunc, Erdogan) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19614960.). Filed by G- C-.(Tunc, Erdogan) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |