7
|
|
7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 08/26 9:00 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 08/02 10:05 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 07/16 9:16 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 07/16 9:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Prisons at the Western Regional Office in Dublin, California, US Attorney, US Attorney General, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 07/16 8:10 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/30/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Proposed Summons. (Wagner, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT Evie Ponder against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19618934.). Filed by Evie Ponder.(Wagner, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|