Morrow v. McMan
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Jeff Armistead |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01158 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 3:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Lindsay McMan
|
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Morrow
13360 SE 122 Ave. Apt A2
Clackamas, OR 97015 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 08/07 1:15 PM
Motion for Reconsideration of Order5 . Filed by Andrea Morrow. (sb) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT
Tue 08/06 1:33 PM
ORDER: Granting6 Application of Andrea Morrow for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Signed on 8/6/2024 by Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/6/2024.) (pjg) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party
Mon 08/05 8:32 AM
Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Andrea Morrow. (dino) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/31 4:36 PM
ORDER TO AMEND: For Morrow to proceed further, an AMENDED COMPLAINT that provides enough factual detail to show that McMan engaged in actions that are not entitled to absolute immunity must be filed within 30 days - or August 30, 2024. Failure to respond to this Order by August 30, 2024, may mean that the court will recommend dismissing this case. The court DEFERS ruling on Morrow's application for IFP status. DATED: July 31, 2024, by United States Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/31/2024.) (pjg) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
limited
Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party
Mon 07/29 11:18 AM
Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dino) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Tue 07/16 4:07 PM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/16/24.) (sb) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 4:06 PM
Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Andrea Morrow against Lindsay McMan. (sb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Tue 07/16 4:02 PM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Andrea Morrow. (sb) |