Jones v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy E Brasel |
Referred: | Douglas L Micko |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02733 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Darci Jones
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 08/02 3:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Darci Jones. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 7/18/2024, answer due 9/16/2024. (Hedrick, Chase) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (LTT) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 07/17 3:41 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil Master 3rd/4th List, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Please use case number 24-cv-2733. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 9:03 AM
COMPLAINT against Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11196470) filed by Darci Jones. Filer requests summons issued. (Hedrick, Chase) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |