Whirlpool Corporation et al v. The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Smith |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-61253 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 8:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
The Individuals, Business Entities, and Unincorporated Associations
|
|
Defendant
petsniceshop.com
|
|
Defendant
reffilterstore.com
|
|
Defendant
slavnofilter.com
|
|
Defendant
svirsonfilter.com
|
|
Plaintiff
Maytag Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Whirlpool Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Whirlpool Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
12
pgs
order
Order on Ex Parte Motion
Wed 09/04 12:06 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 9/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (kpe) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
MOTION Hearing or Evidentiary Motion Hearing
Tue 09/03 10:05 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Smith: Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2024, 9:30-9:35am re9 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Whirlpool Properties, Inc., Whirlpool Corporation, Maytag Properties, LLC. The Court having heard from plaintiff's counsel found that plaintiff had met their burden, therefore the Court granted said motion. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez, Court Reporter: Ellen Rassie, 954-769-5448 / ellen_rassie@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pm) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/30 6:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. re13 Sealed Document,18 Bond,10 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof ,19 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal Document ,14 Sealed Document,12 Order on Motion to Seal,8 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4,7 Response to Order to Show Cause,15 Order on Ex Parte Motion,11 Order of Recusal,6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,17 Order on Ex Parte Motion,4 Order to Show Cause,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,3 Form AO 120/121, 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment,1 Complaint,5 Order,9 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/30 6:10 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE upon Defendants via Electronic Mail by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. re19 Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal Document ,17 Order on Ex Parte Motion,1 Complaint,9 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Against Defendants and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Sevice | ||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Thu 08/29 11:31 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Whirlpool Corporation, Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Properties, Inc..(Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Amended Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Whirlpool Trademarks, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Amended Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Maytag Trademark | ||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Compliance
Mon 08/26 8:50 AM
NOTICE of Compliance re20 Order on Motion to Unseal Documents. All documents in this case are now unsealed per DE#20. (scn) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Unseal Document
Mon 08/26 8:44 AM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's19 MOTION to Unseal. The Clerk shall UNSEAL all docket entries in this case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Unseal Document
Fri 08/23 12:25 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Unseal Document by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. Responses due by 9/6/2024.(Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Bond
Thu 08/22 10:00 AM
Bond on Injunction BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. Approved by Judge Rodney Smith. (drz) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Mon 08/19 8:17 AM
ORDER Granting8 Motion to Seal. Schedule "A" to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be filed under seal and shall remain under seal until further order from this Court. The Summonses in this matter shall be filed and issued under seal and shall remain under seal until further order from this Court. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Thu 08/01 7:55 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge David S. Leibowitz recused. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 7/31/2024. See attached document for full details. (yar) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Motion to Seal (Public)
Wed 07/31 2:54 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 07/31 2:51 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re4 Order to Show Cause,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc.. (Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/31 2:46 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Corporation, Whirlpool Properties, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Whirlpool International Holdings S.a.r.l., Corporate Parent KitchenAid Delaware, Inc., Corporate Parent 1900 Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Whirlpool Holdings Corporation for Maytag Properties, LLC (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 07/22 2:46 PM
ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 7/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/18 8:57 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING JOINDER OF PARTIES re1 Complaint, filed by Whirlpool Properties, Inc., Whirlpool Corporation, Maytag Properties, LLC. as to1 Complaint. ( Responses due by 7/31/2024.) Show Cause Response due by 7/31/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 7/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Form AO 120/121
Wed 07/17 1:29 PM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ar24) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 07/17 1:11 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 10:51 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17683712, filed by Whirlpool Corporation, Maytag Properties, LLC, Whirlpool Properties, Inc..(Gaffigan, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Whirlpool Trademarks, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Maytag Trademarks |