Sarff v. Does 1-5 et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick J Schiltz |
Referred: | Leo I Brisbois |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02734 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Crow Wing County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Does 1-5
|
|
Plaintiff
Shane Michael Sarff
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 08/26 5:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Crow Wing County. Crow Wing County waiver sent on 8/6/2024, answer due 10/7/2024. (Hruby, Vicki) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/26 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki A Hruby on behalf of Crow Wing County. (Hruby, Vicki) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 7:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Crow Wing County, John Does 1-5. (BTX) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 07/18 7:57 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (5th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-2734 (PJS/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 9:45 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11196669) filed by Shane Michael Sarff. Filer requests summons issued. (Rice, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |