Hood v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Holly A Brady |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00294 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
CSX Transportation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meco Hood
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/22 4:23 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc... (Chiavetta PHV, Thomas) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 08/16 1:51 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins:6 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement is deficient under General Order 2023-06. Notwithstanding the stay of case (ECF 8), Defendant is ordered to file an amended corporate disclosure statement on or before 8/23/2024. Text entry order.(mr) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 08/16 11:11 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The7 Joint Motion to Stay the Case for 60 days is granted. Case stayed until 10/16/2024. Text entry order.(mr) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stay
Wed 08/14 5:35 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Chiavetta PHV, Thomas) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/14 5:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Chiavetta PHV, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
order
Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/08 3:31 PM
ORDER granting4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas R Chiavetta PHV for CSX Transportation, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/8/2024. (ace) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/06 4:00 PM
Application for Attorney Thomas R. Chiavetta Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5647194(Chiavetta, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 DC Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 NY Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 07/26 11:36 AM
Set Answer Deadline per3 Affidavit of Service. Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. answer due by 8/14/2024. (ash) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 07/25 11:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on CSX Transportation, Inc. on 7/24/2024, filed by Meco Hood. (Thompson, Nicholas) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 9:03 AM
Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/18 8:54 AM
**NEW CASE** Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against CSX Transportation, Inc.( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5628515.), filed by Meco Hood.(Thompson, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |