Dalton v. TJX Companies Inc., The
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Leo I Brisbois |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02735 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
TJX Companies Inc., The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julie Dalton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 08/06 8:54 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/6/2024. (JLB) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Fri 08/02 3:45 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint filed by TJX Companies Inc., The.(Skahan, Sharde) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/02 3:43 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint filed by TJX Companies Inc., The. (Skahan, Sharde) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/23 9:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Dalton. TJX Companies Inc., The served on 7/22/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (Michenfelder, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 8:49 AM
Summons Issued as to TJX Companies Inc., The. (MMP) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 07/18 8:49 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Civil Rights: Housing/Accomodation ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-2735 (DWF/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
24
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 10:12 AM
COMPLAINT against The TJX Companies Inc. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11196781) filed by Julie Dalton. Filer requests summons issued. (Gustafson, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |