Repinski v. Kohler Company et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Halil S Ozerden |
Referred: | Bradley W Rath |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00104 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 4:47 AM CDT |
Defendant
Kaye Boone - Woody
|
|
Defendant
Kohler Company
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
Dale Repinski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 07/26 2:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dale Repinski. Kohler Company waiver sent on 7/22/2024, answer due 9/20/2024. (Dillard, Joel) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 07/26 2:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dale Repinski. Kaye Boone - Woody waiver sent on 7/22/2024, answer due 9/20/2024. (Dillard, Joel) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Mon 07/22 3:05 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kaye Boone-Woody on 07/22/2024 by Dale Repinski. Waiver of Service due by 8/21/2024 (Dillard, Joel) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Mon 07/22 2:44 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kohler Company on 07/22/2024 by Dale Repinski. Waiver of Service due by 8/21/2024 (Dillard, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 12:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Kaye Boone - Woody, Kohler Company. (CAD) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 11:05 AM
**ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** Summons Issued as to Kohler Company. (CAD) Modified on 7/17/2024 (CAD) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 11:03 AM
**ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** Summons Issued as to Kaye Boone - Woody. (CAD) Modified on 7/17/2024 (CAD) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 07/17 12:32 PM
Docket Annotation as to Doc.2 3 : There is an error in these entries, and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as Doc.4 . (CAD) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT against Kaye Boone - Woody, John Does 1-10, Kohler Company (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5452001), filed by Dale Repinski.(CAD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 |