Ross et al v. Columbus Board of Education et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edmund A Sargus |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03713 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:53 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
Ms. Jodi Fullerton
6147047585 473 Catawba Ave.
Westerville, OH 43081 |
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Columbus Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Columbus Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jodi Fullerton
|
|
Defendant
Ms. Jodi Fullerton
6147047585 473 Catawba Ave.
Westerville, OH 43081 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Ross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Ross
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Wed 09/04 11:09 AM
ANSWER to9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Columbus Board of Education. (Williams, Richard) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 08/30 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2024 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Thu 08/29 12:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Columbus Board of Education filed by Jodi Fullerton. (Steele, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/16 11:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Columbus Board of Education. (er) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/16 10:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed: Columbus Board of Education served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (er) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/13 12:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed: Jodi Fullerton served on 8/9/2024, answer due 8/30/2024. (er) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Fri 08/09 11:00 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk of the complaint, the notice, consent, and reference of a civil action to a magistrate judge form and the issued summons were sent by certified mail to Defendants Columbus Board of Education (7013-2630-0002-4066-3074) and Jodi Fullerton (7013-2630-0002-4066-3081) on 8/9/24. (sem) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/08 9:33 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Columbus Board of Education. (Williams, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Tue 08/06 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk of the Complaint and Summons via Certified Mail to Defendants Columbus Board of Education (7021-0950-0000-3688-7727) and Jodi Fullerton (7021-0950-0000-3688-7710). (sem) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 8:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Columbus Board of Education & Jodi Fullerton. (er) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10070567), filed by Amanda Ross, Kenneth Ross. (Klebanow, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form of Columbus Board of Education and Jodi Fullerton |