PATTERSON v. RIVERS CASINO
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul S Diamond |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03115 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 05:704 Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, 240601261 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
RIVERS CASINO
1001 N. DELAWARE AVENUE
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19125 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DWAYNE L PATTERSON
3818 N. 13TH STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19140 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 08/30 8:49 AM
ORDER THAT THE14 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE IS GRANTED. THE PARTIES MAY FILE THE JOINT STATUS REPORT NO LATER THAN TWO WEEKS AFTER THE DISPOSITION OF THE TITLE VII EMPLOYMENT PANELS DECISION REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF PRO BONO COUNSEL FOR PATTERSON. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/29/24.8/30/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE, E-MAILED.(lisad, ) Modified on 8/30/2024 (lisad, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 08/22 10:12 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time filed by DWAYNE L PATTERSON.(fdc) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/21 4:02 PM
STATUS REPORT of Defendant Pursuant to Rule 26(F) by RIVERS CASINO. (GREEN, ABIGAIL) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Re: Attorney Panel
Mon 08/12 9:30 AM
ORDER THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO THE CLERKS OFFICE SO ATTEMPTS CAN BE MADE TO OBTAIN COUNSEL THROUGH THE "TITLE VII EMPLOYMENT PANEL" IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE PRO BONO PROGRAM WHICH HAS BEEN APPROVED BY THE COURT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/12/24. 8/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PATTERSON AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 08/12 7:55 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by DWAYNE L PATTERSON. (dt) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Tue 08/06 12:03 PM
DOC. 10 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 08/05 2:44 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. PARTIES MAY FILE THE JOINT STATUS REPORT NO LATER THAN 8/21/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/5/24.8/5/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO PATTERSON.(fdc) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 08/01 3:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time due to Medical Records filed by DWAYNE L PATTERSON.(fdc) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Standing Order
Wed 07/24 12:20 PM
STANDING ORDER. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/24/24. 7/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. (fdc) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/24 10:00 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by RIVERS CASINO.(GREEN, ABIGAIL) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/24 9:44 AM
ORDER THAT THE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE (CRAIG M. STRAW). IF THE DISTRICT JUDGE DEEMS REFERRAL APPROPRIATE, A SEPARATE REFERRAL ORDER, SPECIFYING THE REASON FOR REFERRAL, WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DISTRICT COURT JUDGE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/24/24. 7/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Mon 07/22 11:37 AM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, ) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Reassigning Case
Fri 07/19 8:20 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/18/24. 7/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PATTERSON AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Wed 07/17 2:42 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (sbt) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Wed 07/17 1:15 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by RIVERS CASINO.(GREEN, ABIGAIL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Attorney)
Wed 07/17 1:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RIVERS CASINO (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17606721), filed by RIVERS CASINO.(GREEN, ABIGAIL) |
|
misc
Remark
Wed 07/17 2:43 PM
Pro Se Guidelines mailed out on 7/17/24. (sbt) |