Garg v. MUSUNURI et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kelley Brisbon Hodge |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03119 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
MICHAEL BREININGER
|
|
Defendant
KRISTEN CASTILLO
|
|
Defendant
JESSICA CRESPO
|
|
Defendant
PRABHAVATHI FERNANDES
|
|
Defendant
UDAY KOMPELLA
|
|
Defendant
RAMESH KUMAR
|
|
Defendant
SHANKAR MUSUNURI
|
|
Defendant
MANISH POTTI
|
|
Defendant
SANJAY SUBRAMANIAN
|
|
Defendant
QUAN VU
|
|
Defendant
MARNA C. WHITTINGTON
|
|
Defendant
JUNGE ZHANG
|
|
Defendant
OCUGEN, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
Priyank Garg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 09/05 4:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases And Appoint Leadership filed by MELISSA VOTER.(DONOVAN, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Declaration
Thu 08/22 6:59 PM
Declaration re6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases And Appoint Leadership by Priyank Garg.(Coyle, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - HH Firm Resume, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - BLF Firm Resume, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Order Granting Consolidation and LS, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Order Granting Consolidation and LS, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Order Granting Consolidation and LS, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Order Granting Consolidation and LS, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Order Granting Consolidation and LS, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Order Granting Consolidation and LS | ||
7 | 7
23
pgs
respm
Memorandum
Thu 08/22 6:54 PM
Memorandum in Support re6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases And Appoint Leadership filed by Priyank Garg. (Coyle, John) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 08/22 6:53 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases And Appoint Leadership filed by Priyank Garg..(Coyle, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 08/19 9:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Priyank Garg. QUAN VU waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (HYNES, MICHAEL) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 08/16 4:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Priyank Garg. MICHAEL BREININGER waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; KRISTEN CASTILLO waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; JESSICA CRESPO waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; PRABHAVATHI FERNANDES waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; UDAY KOMPELLA waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; RAMESH KUMAR waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; SHANKAR MUSUNURI waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; OCUGEN, INC. waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; MANISH POTTI waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; SANJAY SUBRAMANIAN waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; MARNA C. WHITTINGTON waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024; JUNGE ZHANG waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (HYNES, MICHAEL) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/06 9:51 AM
ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: (1) SEVEN (7) DAYS PRIOR TO ANY MOTION BEING FILED (INCLUDING A MOTION UNDER FED.R.CIV.P. 12 OR 56, 28 U.S.C. § 1441, OR 28 U.S.C. § 1404), COUNSEL MUST NOTIFY OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE POTENTIAL MOTION, AND THE POSSIBLE RESOLUTION OF SAME. THESE DISCUSSIONS SHALL BE SUBSTANTIVE AND NOT PERFUNCTORY. TO THIS END, COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE THE OPPOSING PARTY WITH AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED DEFECTS PRIOR TO FILING A MOTION; (2) IN THE EVENT THE PARTIES ARE UNABLE TO PRELIMINARILY NEGATE THE NEED FOR THE FILING OF A MOTION AFTER ENGAGING IN SUBSTANTIVE DISCUSSIONS, THE MOVING PARTY SHALL SO SPECIFY IN A CERTIFICATION ATTACHED AND FILED WITH THE MOTION. SAID CERTIFICATION SHALL INDICATE THE DATE(S) OF DISCUSSION(S) AND SHALL INFORM THE COURT OF THE PARTIES INABILITY TO REACH A RESOLUTION; (3) FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER SHALL RESULT IN DENIAL OF THE MOTION WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 8/6/2024. 8/6/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 9:59 AM
Summons Issued as to MICHAEL BREININGER, KRISTEN CASTILLO, JESSICA CRESPO, PRABHAVATHI FERNANDES, UDAY KOMPELLA, RAMESH KUMAR, SHANKAR MUSUNURI, OCUGEN, INC., MANISH POTTI, SANJAY SUBRAMANIAN, QUAN VU, MARNA C. WHITTINGTON, JUNGE ZHANG. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 7/18/2024 (sg) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
90
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Wed 07/17 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against MICHAEL BREININGER, KRISTEN CASTILLO, JESSICA CRESPO, PRABHAVATHI FERNANDES, UDAY KOMPELLA, RAMESH KUMAR, SHANKAR MUSUNURI, OCUGEN, INC., MANISH POTTI, SANJAY SUBRAMANIAN, QUAN VU, MARNA C. WHITTINGTON, JUNGE ZHANG ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17606991.), filed by Priyank Garg.(HYNES, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |