Krusell v. Snyder et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Maloney |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00731 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:49 AM EDT |
defendant
Angela Snyder
|
|
defendant
Merrit Vogel
|
|
plaintiff
Michael Krusell
2529 Atkins Road
Petoskey, MI 49770 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 08/26 2:27 PM
Copy of Order Regarding Report and Recommendation9 , Judgment10 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Krusell (eod) |
||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment
Fri 08/23 3:33 PM
JUDGMENT ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order Regarding Report and Recommendation
Fri 08/23 3:33 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION6 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Objection
Thu 08/22 2:37 PM
OBJECTION re6 (eod) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Supplement
Thu 08/08 8:34 AM
SUPPLEMENT re complaint1 (eod) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 07/29 1:08 PM
Copy of Report and Recommendation6 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Krusell (pjw) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 07/26 3:51 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 10:02 AM
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 07/18 2:12 PM
Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis5 , Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge4 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Krusell (klb) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/17 4:32 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Receipt of Case Notice
Wed 07/17 2:35 PM
NOTICE of receipt of case (eod) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees
Wed 07/17 2:34 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (eod) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Angela Snyder, Merrit Vogel filed by Michael Krusell (eod) Modified text on 7/17/2024 (eod) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 07/17 2:38 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael Krusell (eod) |