Oyedele v. Rice et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Elizabeth Cowan Wright |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02766 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steve Rice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ifeoluwa Oyeyemi Oyedele
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Steve Rice. (Hoskins, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 3:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Steve Rice. (ABR) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 07/17 3:22 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 24-cv-2766 (DWF/ECW). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 1:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Steve Rice (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11198196) filed by Ifeoluwa Oyeyemi Oyedele. Filer requests summons issued. (Prokosch, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |