Massey v. Jackson
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Anne R Traum |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00316 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 08/09 11:49 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable (not at this address) re3 Order, addressed to Jacob Angelo Massey. (GA) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/29 9:31 AM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff has until September 25, 2024, to either pay the full $405 filing fee or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three required documents: (1) a completed application with the inmate's two signatures on page 3, (2) a completed financial certificate that is signed both by the inmate and the prison or jail official, and (3) a copy of the inmate's trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. Plaintiff is cautioned that this action will be subject to dismissal without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff Jacob Angelo Massey the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same and retain the complaint ECF No.1 -1) but not file it at this time (sent on 7/29/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/29/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Form with Instructions | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Wed 07/17 12:26 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DLS) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Receipt Initiating Documents
Wed 07/17 12:24 PM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (DLS) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint |