FANTAYE v. BLINKEN et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul S Diamond |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03125 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Secretary of State Office of Legal Advisor 600 19th Street NW, Suite 5600
Washington, DC 20522 |
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
|
|
Plaintiff
Konjit FANTAYE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/05 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN E. LINDGREN on behalf of ANTONY BLINKEN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE with Certificate of Service(LINDGREN, ERIN) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 08/14 2:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Plaintiff re: served Summons and Complaint upon US Sec of State by Certified Mail on 8/12/2024 (EATON, JONAH) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney
Mon 08/05 4:10 PM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (fdc) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 08/05 2:30 PM
Summons Issued as to ANTONY BLINKEN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: U.S. Attorney's Office (with acceptance of service & complaint) and Jonah Eaton on 8/5/24 (fdc) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 08/05 2:25 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 20022390 (fdc) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/24 10:25 AM
ORDER THAT THE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. IF THE DISTRICT JUDGE DEEMS REFERRAL APPROPRIATE, A SEPARATE REFERRAL ORDER, SPECIFYING THE REASON FOR REFERRAL, WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DISTRICT COURT JUDGE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/24/24. 7/24/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/22 2:22 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED.SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/22/24.7/22/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/17 3:40 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Konjit FANTAYE..(EATON, JONAH) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (IFP or Government Plaintiff)
Wed 07/17 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Konjit FANTAYE.(EATON, JONAH) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2024) (sbt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form |