Cooper v. Novo Nordisk et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03121 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Texas Southern, 4:24-cv-02100 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK NORTH AMERICA OPERATIONS A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES L.P.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK RESEARCH CENTER SEATTLE INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK US COMMERCIAL HOLDINGS INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK US HOLDINGS INC.
|
|
Defendant
Novo Nordisk Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Larry Gene Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 07/17 2:17 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:24-cv-02100. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case transferred electronically. (ltg4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2024.] | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/17 2:20 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. Southern District of Texas, 4:24-cv-2100. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3121. (sbt) |
||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer
Wed 07/17 10:16 AM
Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case transferred electronically. (ltg4) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/17 10:15 AM
JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16) transferring case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania to be included in MDL Docket No. 3094. (ltg4) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/20/2024 at 10:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified. (rrb4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2024.] | |
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-31714872) filed by Larry Gene Cooper. (Coon, Brent) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 7/17/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |