Tompor v. Comerica Bank
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Terrence G Berg |
Referred: | Anthony P Patti |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11843 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oakland County Circuit Court, 24-208038-CH |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 8:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Comerica Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth E. Tompor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 08/20 10:06 AM
REPLY to Response re3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Comerica Bank. (Katz, Erin) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 08/06 3:55 PM
RESPONSE to3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kenneth E. Tompor. (Linnell, Richard) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Fri 07/26 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Jacobs on behalf of Comerica Bank. (Jacobs, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/24 8:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Comerica Bank. (Katz, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Mortgage, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Assignment of Mortgage, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Loan Modification, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - HELOC Mortgage, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Notice of Default, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Demand Notice, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Sheriff's Deed | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Thu 07/18 9:16 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MCho) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Wed 07/17 3:28 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Comerica Bank (Katz, Erin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Notice of Removal
Wed 07/17 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Comerica Bank from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2024-208038-CH. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9866339 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Katz, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Sheriff's Deed on Mortgage Sale |