Salmons v. O'Malley
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Irene C Berger |
Referred: | Joseph Keith Reeder |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00358 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Transferring MJ Referral for Pretrial and PF&R
Tue 09/03 11:16 AM
CLERK'S ORDER. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert, the above-styled civil action is referred to Honorable Joseph Keith Reeder for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 9/3/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement Of Visiting Attorney - DO NOT USE FOR BANKRUPTCY PHV Matters
Wed 07/31 10:34 AM
STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from David F. Chermol on behalf of Deanna Salmons. Local counsel: Michael C. Cardi. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8702389. (Cardi, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Thu 07/18 9:20 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8694085. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 07/18 9:14 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc) |