Viglione et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy Joseph |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00896 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Milwaukee County, 24-CV-4803 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Viglione
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Viglione
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/22 4:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 8/22/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2024, Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 8/30/2024, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 10/30/2024, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 1/30/2025, Discovery due by 3/31/2025, Interim Settlement Report due by 3/31/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2025. (cc: all counsel)(edr) |
|
17 | 17
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Order on Motion to Bifurcate Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 08/22 2:34 PM
Minute Entry for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph held on 8/22/2024. The Court GRANTED the parties' oral, joint Motion to Bifurcate and Stay. The Court adopted the following deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2024, Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 8/30/2024, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 10/30/2024, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 1/30/2025, Discovery due by 3/31/2025, Interim Settlement Report due by 3/31/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2025. (Court Reporter Zoom Audio.) (edr) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Bifurcate Stay
Thu 08/22 2:12 PM
ORAL JOINT MOTION to Bifurcate and to Stay by All Plaintiffs and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (edr) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 08/15 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 2:00 PM by Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel)(edr) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing Via Zoom
Thu 08/15 1:09 PM
ZOOM INFORMATION for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. [LINK:Click here to Join ZoomGov Meeting] Meeting ID: 161 200 1332 and Password: 781911 Dial in:[LINK:+1-669-254-5252] or[LINK:+1-646-828-7666] (cc: all counsel) (edr) |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent
Thu 08/08 12:31 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/8/2024. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(mew) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/07 2:45 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wallace, Justin) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Thu 08/01 4:25 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Malloy, Mark) |
|
order
~Util - Terminate Motions Text Only Order
Thu 08/01 8:15 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 8/1/2024. Upon consideration of Defendant's motion to dismiss or, alternatively, to bifurcate and stay9 , the motion is denied. The Court's pretrial order6 provides that any motion to dismiss or other motion under Rule 12 must be accompanied by a written certification that the parties met and conferred, which certification should be filed separately on the docket and not hidden within a brief or attachment. No such certification accompanies Defendant's motion. (cc: all counsel) (gap) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit
Wed 07/31 12:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Mark D. Malloy .(Malloy, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 9.21.23 Estimate and Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 10.20.23 Estimate and Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - GeoHazards Report | ||
10 | 10
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Wed 07/31 12:05 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re9 MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively MOTION to Bifurcate MOTION to Stay . (Malloy, Mark) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Bifurcate Stay
Wed 07/31 12:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or alternatively , MOTION to Bifurcate , MOTION to Stay by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Malloy, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hailey Morgan Anick on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Hailey M Anick (Anick, Hailey) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/19 10:38 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Wallace, Justin) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Pretrial Order
Thu 07/18 10:32 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/18/2024. Judge Stadtmueller has adopted revised pretrial procedures for civil cases. Counsel for all parties should carefully review this Order and may contact chambers if they have any questions about the matters addressed herein. (cc: all counsel) (gap) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/17 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean A Bukowski on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean A. Bukowski (Bukowski, Sean) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/17 3:12 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Malloy, Mark) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/17 3:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Malloy, Mark) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/17 3:08 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Malloy, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/17 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Milwaukee County, Case Number: 24-CV-4803 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4723435)(Malloy, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing (State Court), | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 07/17 2:34 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller: Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ams) |