Navarro v. Santa Cruz, County of et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Scott H Rash |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00353 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
service
Service Executed
Thu 08/15 10:58 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Augustine Huerta on 7/31/24. (BAC) |
|
14 | 14
service
Service Executed
Thu 08/15 10:55 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED: Record of Acceptance of Service re: Summons upon Santa Cruz, County of on 7/23/24. (BAC) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 08/14 11:20 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, Defendants'12 Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Responsive Pleading is GRANTED. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due by 9/13/24. Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 8/13/24. (BAC) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 08/13 1:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Augustine Huerta, Santa Cruz, County of.(Porter, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Tue 08/13 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Francis Porter on behalf of Augustine Huerta, Santa Cruz, County of. (Porter, Brendan) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service Executed
Tue 08/13 11:10 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Christian Hernandez, Carmen Hernandez Navarro: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon Augustin Huerta #148 on 7/31/2024. (Slack-Mendez, Charles) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Tue 08/13 11:08 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Christian Hernandez, Carmen Hernandez Navarro: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon Santa Cruz County on 7/23/2024. (Slack-Mendez, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case No Longer Referred
Tue 07/30 12:30 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If properly completed, the Clerk of Court must issue the proposed Summonses filed at Doc.6 . Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 7/29/2024. (SCA) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 10:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Santa Cruz, County of.(BAC) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Amended Doc (NOT Motion/Complaint/Cross/Counter/3rd Party Claim)
Fri 07/19 9:04 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Carmen Hernandez Navarro. Amendment to3 Summons Submitted . (Slack-Mendez, Charles) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Fri 07/19 8:40 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:3 Summons Submitted filed by Carmen Hernandez Navarro as to Santa Cruz County Board of Supervisors not issued as defendant name does not match any defendant parties listed on complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please, resubmit summons form with defendant name that matches complaint for issuance. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REM) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 8:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Augustine Huerta. (REM) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Wed 07/17 1:48 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Carmen Hernandez Navarro.(SCA) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Wed 07/17 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SCA) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 1:46 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23254773 filed by Carmen Hernandez Navarro. (Slack-Mendez, Charles)(SCA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |