State of Florida v. Rudnikas
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-22733 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 8:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Benzo Elias Rudnikas
950 SW 57th Ave Apt 711
Miami, FL 33144 |
|
Plaintiff
State of Florida
|
|
Respondent
Mercedes Gisela Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/13 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Filing Additional Exhibits in support by Benzo Elias Rudnikas re11 Response in Opposition to Motion, (ls) |
|
Att: 1 140 pgs Exhibits | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
119
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/08 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Referenced in Defendant's Verified Response in Opposition to Motion for Remand by Benzo Elias Rudnikas re11 Response in Opposition to Motion. (drz) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
10
pgs
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 08/06 5:18 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Remand to State Court and Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Mercedes Gisela Gonzalez.(Billbrough, G.) |
|
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit 1 - Motion for Injunction | ||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Hearing
Tue 08/06 9:52 AM
MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Benzo Elias Rudnikas. (for image see de11 ) (drz) |
|
11 | 11
13
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 08/06 9:49 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Remand to State Court and Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Benzo Elias Rudnikas. Replies due by 8/12/2024.(drz) |
|
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 08/02 1:40 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Motion for Remand on or before August 5, 2024 . Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/2/2024. (jck) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 08/02 3:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to5 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Remand to State Court and Motion for Attorney Fees . (per order DE#10) Responses due by 8/5/2024. (drz) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 08/02 1:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to5 EMERGENCY EXPEDITED MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Remand to State Court and Motion for Attorney Fees by Benzo Elias Rudnikas. (drz) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/23 11:23 AM
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CLARIFICATION by Benzo Elias Rudnikas re 7 Order Striking,5 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Remand to State Court and Motion for Attorney Fees (drz) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Striking - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 07/22 3:06 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING the Emergency designation of5 Emergency Motion for Remand. Although Respondent Mercedes Gisela Gonzalez complied with the requirement to title the motion as an "Emergency Motion" and to certify that the Motion presents a true emergency requiring an immediate ruling because meaningful relief could not be provided after seven days, Respondent, however, failed to set forth (1) the nature of the emergency; (2) the date by which a ruling is necessary; and (3) the reason the ruling is needed by the stated date. See S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(2), (d)(1). Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to STRIKE the emergency designation of5 Emergency Motion for Remand. The Motion for Remand itself shall remain pending. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/22/2024. (jck) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/22 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED ORDER by Mercedes Gisela Gonzalez re5 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Remand to State Court and Motion for Attorney Fees (Billbrough, G.) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order on Emergency Motion | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
21
pgs
motion
Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency
Fri 07/19 3:13 PM
EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Remand to State Court and Motion for Attorney Fees by Mercedes Gisela Gonzalez. Responses due by 8/2/2024.(Billbrough, G.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning/Transferring Case
Thu 07/18 2:39 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Jose E. Martinez for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 07/018/2024. Judge K. Michael Moore no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee)
Wed 07/17 4:44 PM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/17/2024 in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number 18733. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 07/17 4:38 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT against State of Florida. Filing fees $ 405.00, filed by Benzo Elias Rudnikas.(wce) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 72 pgs Exhibit |