Ware v. Bay, County of et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas L Ludington |
Referred: | Patricia T Morris |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-11840 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 8:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bay, County of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Juliann Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Ware
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/14 4:46 PM
STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the1 Complaint, ( Response due by 9/13/2024. ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) |
|
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/14 10:49 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Juliann Reynolds served on 7/22/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (Kelly, Kevin) [DATE OF SERVICE IS 7/26/2024, ANSWER DUE 8/16/2024] Modified on 8/14/2024 (CShr) |
|
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/14 10:45 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bay, County of served on 7/24/2024, answer due 8/14/2024. (Kelly, Kevin) [GREEN CARD NOT ATTACHED] Modified on 8/14/2024 (CShr) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Mon 08/12 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carlito H. Young on behalf of All Defendants. (Young, Carlito) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Attorney Appearance
Thu 08/08 10:24 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrea Marie Pike appearing on behalf of Bay, County of, Juliann Reynolds (Pike, Andrea) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/22 1:57 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor Joseph Mastromarco, III appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/22 1:54 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued*
Mon 07/22 10:45 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Juliann Reynolds* (MSyl) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued*
Mon 07/22 10:44 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Bay, County of* (MSyl) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Correction
Mon 07/22 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Correction re3 Summons Issued. (MSyl) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued*
Thu 07/18 11:47 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (MSyl) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Thu 07/18 11:49 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MSyl) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error*
Wed 07/17 4:41 PM
Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge Laurie J. Michelson* and *Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman* in Detroit to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris in Bay City (SSch) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Wed 07/17 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9865987 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Bay - County Where Action Arose: Bay - County of 1st Defendant: Bay. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Kelly, Kevin) |