Emery et al v. SECURA Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry W Blackwell |
Referred: | John F Docherty |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02769 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:53 AM CDT |
Defendant
Secura Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurt Emery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Emery
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order Staying Case
Thu 08/22 1:23 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE on9 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 8/22/2024.(TJS) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/22 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mackenzie Marrin on behalf of Secura Insurance Company. (Marrin, Mackenzie) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Thu 08/22 10:12 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re9 Stipulation. (Prouty, Beth) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/22 10:09 AM
STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings by Secura Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Kurt Emery and Michelle Emery. (Prouty, Beth) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/22 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Beth A Jenson Prouty on behalf of Secura Insurance Company. (Prouty, Beth) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/29 8:42 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kurt Emery, Michelle Emery. Secura Insurance Company served on 7/24/2024, answer due 8/14/2024. (Watton, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Wed 07/24 9:20 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Melissa L. Watton re1 Complaint,5 Amended Complaint, Affidavit of Compliance byKurt Emery, Michelle Emery. (Watton, Melissa) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/22 11:56 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Secura Insurance Company. filed by Kurt Emery, Michelle Emery. No summons requested. (Watton, Melissa) Modified text on 7/22/2024 (kt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Briefing Order
Fri 07/19 4:44 PM
ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD FEDERAL SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 7/19/2024. (RM) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 5:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Secura Insurance Company. (MMG) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 07/17 5:11 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 24-cv-2769 JWB/JFD. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT against SECURA Insurance Company (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11198885) filed by Kurt Emery, Michelle Emery. Filer requests summons issued. (Watton, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |