Yusuf et al v. Blinken et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine M Menendez |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02770 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:53 AM CDT |
Defendant
Antony Blinken
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Conn Schrader
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Linnisa Wahid
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isxaaq Moalin Hassan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suleqa Mohamed Yusuf
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory G Brooker on behalf of Antony Blinken, Conn Schrader, Linnisa Wahid. (Brooker, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 3:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Antony Blinken, Conn Schrader, Linnisa Wahid. (CLK) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 07/17 3:58 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-2770 KMM/TNL. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11199049) filed by Suleqa Mohamed Yusuf. Filer requests summons issued. (Hines, Kelsey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |