W. et al v. Gartner et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Jill N Parrish |
Referred: | Daphne A Oberg |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00504 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:53 AM MDT |
Defendant
Gartner
|
|
Defendant
Gartner Self-Funded Health and Welfare Benefit Plan
|
|
Plaintiff
Faith W.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. W.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurt W.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Acknowledgment
Mon 07/29 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order4 filed by Plaintiffs J. W., Kurt W., Faith W. (Nielson, Laura) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Order to Propose Schedule
Fri 07/26 2:44 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 7/25/2024. (haa) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Civil Standing Order
Tue 07/23 1:18 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/23/2024. (lwh) |
|
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/23 1:45 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/23/2024. (lwh) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Thu 07/18 8:45 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiffs J. W., Kurt W., Faith W.. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 8/8/2024. (sg) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Wed 07/17 5:13 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5127416) filed by Faith W., Kurt W., J. W.. (Nielson, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
2
pgs
misc
Remark - New Case
Wed 07/17 2:45 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs J. W., Kurt W., Faith W. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (sg) |