Hampton et al v. The Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Alistair Newbern |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00863 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 7:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
Glenn Funk
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Laura Henry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chadwick Wyatt Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Deborah Neal
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Swann
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Hospital Authority of Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson county, Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Webb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hampton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Toni Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Fri 09/06 1:48 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to26 Response to Motion, filed by Glenn Funk . (Donica, Eric) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 09/06 1:46 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to26 Response to Motion, by Glenn Funk. (Donica, Eric) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Fri 09/06 9:14 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Eric William Donica admitted to this court . (ad) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 09/05 11:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Funk filed by Michael Hampton.(Scruggs, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Abrego v. Guevara, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Gressett v. Contra Costa County | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/05 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric William Donica on behalf of Glenn Funk (Donica, Eric) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
27
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Fri 08/23 1:54 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Glenn Funk . (Ahillen, Joseph) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 08/23 1:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Glenn Funk.(Ahillen, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Criminal Court Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Tue 08/13 9:32 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendant Deborah Neal filed an unopposed motion to extend the time to file a responsive pleading and to continue the initial case management conference set on September 18, 2024. (Doc. No. 17.) The Court granted the extension and stated that it would reset the initial case management conference by separate order. (Doc. No. 21.) The initial case management conference was reset to October 22, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. by the Court's August 6, 2024 order (Doc. No. 15). Because the requested relief has already been granted, no further order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on August 13, 2024. (AN) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/09 12:48 PM
ORDER: The Motion19 for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint is GRANTED. The initial case management conference will be reset by separate order. Deborah Neal answer due 10/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 08/09/24. (ad) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/09 12:44 PM
ORDER: The Motion17 for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED. Glenn Funk answer due 8/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 08/09/24. (ad) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/09 11:13 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Deborah Neal. (Cooper, David) |
|
18 | 18
3
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Fri 08/09 10:23 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Glenn Funk . (Ahillen, Joseph) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/09 10:21 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,,,, by Glenn Funk. (Ahillen, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 08/08 10:08 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for David L. Cooper admitted to this court . (ad) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/07 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Cooper on behalf of Deborah Neal (Cooper, David) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/06 1:40 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Laura Henry answer due 10/8/2024; Mark Swann answer due 10/8/2024; The Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee answer due 10/8/2024; Joseph Webb answer due 10/8/2024. The initial case management conference set on September 18, 2024, is CONTINUED to October 22, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall file a joint proposed initial case management order by October 18, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/6/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 08/06 1:41 PM
Reset Hearing per Order15 : Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 10/22/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/05 11:02 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,,,, by Laura Henry, Mark Swann, The Hospital Authority of Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson county, Tennessee, The Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee, Joseph Webb. (Fox, J.) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/31 1:57 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Hampton. Mark Swann served on 7/26/2024. (Scruggs, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/23 1:01 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Hampton. Deborah Neal served on 7/22/2024. (Scruggs, Mark) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/23 1:00 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Hampton. The Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee served on 7/19/2024. (Scruggs, Mark) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/23 12:58 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Hampton. Glenn Funk served on 7/19/2024. (Scruggs, Mark) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/23 12:54 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Hampton. Joseph Webb served on 7/22/2024. (Scruggs, Mark) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/23 12:52 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Hampton. Laura Henry served on 7/23/2024. (Scruggs, Mark) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/23 12:50 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Hampton. The Hospital Authority of Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson county, Tennessee served on 7/22/2024. (Scruggs, Mark) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/18 9:54 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/18/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (am) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Wed 07/17 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/18/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ch) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 5:01 PM
Summons issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (ch) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Wed 07/17 4:46 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ch) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Wed 07/17 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ch) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 07/17 5:04 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark Christopher Scruggs admitted to this court . (ch) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 4:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Glenn Funk, Laura Henry, Chadwick Wyatt Jackson, Deborah Neal, Mark Swann, The Hospital Authority of Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee, The Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County, Tennessee, Joseph Webb (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4121221), filed by Toni Taylor, Michael Hampton.(ch) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Metro& DA organizational charts, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Metro BL2016-540, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Shulman Audit Request, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Transcript of Metro meeting of 8 14-2017 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Swann Fraud Report, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Shulman Interview 8 15-2017 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Email re Anthem Care meeting, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Hospital Authority letters of acceptance of audit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Metro acceptance of audit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - TBI confirmation of DA investigation, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Goodman request for Audit of RTAs, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Henry phony spreadsheet, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Vision v Metro TAC, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Jackson email 7-12-22 re no regulations for RTAs, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - State Supp.Response re; RTA regulations, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Sample Resident-Knowles agreement, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - J.Dalton Order dismissing 2018-D-2602, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - State Stipulations in 2018-D-2602, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - Metro Law opinion 2008-03, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - 2017 GSPC report, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - Nahley interview 1 25-2018 | ||
Att: 22 Attachment - Hampton & Taylor Oaths, | ||
Att: 23 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet |