M. v. United States of America (Federal Bureau of Prisons) et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04294 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 08/12 10:53 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings.Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by The Clerk on 08/12/2024.(kxo, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Relating Case
Fri 08/09 10:09 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER. 24-cv-4294-JSW is related to 22-cv-5137-YGR. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/9/2024. (eac, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 08/05 2:35 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 08/05/2024.(kxo, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 08/05 12:15 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Saturday, August 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Sat 08/03 7:43 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J. M... (Pride, Jessica) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 08/02 6:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 07/18 11:48 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The Application to Maintain the Anonymity of Plaintiff, the Declaration ISO Application, and [Proposed] Order (Attachments 1-2; 1-3; 1-4 to the Complaint) must be e-filed separately, and not as an attachment to the Complaint or other initiating documents.Please re-file the Application in its entirety, using the appropriate Motion event. The Declaration and [Proposed] Order must be re-filed as well.*** Re:1 Complaint, filed by J. M. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 07/18 12:35 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***For the Proposed Summons, there are defendants listed on the filing who are not named within the Complaint/Docket Sheet. This filing will not be processed by the Clerk's Office. Please amend and re-file in its entirety.*** Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by J. M. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 07/17 3:35 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 07/17 3:20 PM
Proposed Summons. (Pride, Jessica) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19630443.). Filed by J M.(Pride, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Application to Proceed Anonymously, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration ISO Proceeding Anonymously, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave |