Omerichamoi v. Home Depot, Inc.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02771 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:53 AM CDT |
Defendant
Home Depot
2455 Paces Ferry Road
Atlanta, GA 30339 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josephina Omerichamoi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Fri 08/16 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2024 at 04:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/16/2024. (HAM) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/15 4:00 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Home Depot. (Huisman, Stephanie) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/15 3:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Home Depot. (Huisman, Stephanie) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 08/01 5:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Josephina Omerichamoi re3 Summons Issued,1 Complaint, (Fondungallah, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Home Depot. (MKB) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 07/18 9:45 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-2771 (DWF/TNL). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 8:43 AM
COMPLAINT Against Home Depot, Inc. against Josephina Omerichamoi (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11199730) filed by Josephina Omerichamoi. Filer requests summons issued. (Fondungallah, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |