Thompson v. Turley
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Scott L Palk |
Referred: | Shon T Erwin |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00719 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Tue 09/03 2:34 PM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL . Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 9/3/2024. (llg) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation
Tue 09/03 2:33 PM
ORDER ADOPTING in its entirety7 Report and Recommendation. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's orders. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 9/3/2024. (llg) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 08/09 11:28 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Court's orders. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral to the undersigned magistrate judge in the captioned matter. Objections to R&R due by 8/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/9/2024. (mc) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 08/09 11:33 AM
Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit
Fri 08/02 5:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT titled, "Affidavit of Exemption from Fees" by Donell Thompson, Jr.(ekw) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/19 12:47 PM
ORDER -- The Court is in receipt of the civil rights complaint Plaintiff has tendered in the above referenced case. In order for this action to proceed, Plaintiff must either pay the $405.00 filing fee or be granted leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated no later than August 5, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 7/19/2024. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/17 6:03 PM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Judge Scott L. Palk on 7/17/2024. (ekw) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 07/17 6:00 PM
ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 7/17/2024. (ekw) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Previous Cases
Wed 07/17 5:55 PM
PREVIOUS Cases (ekw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 5:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Terri Turley filed by Donell Thompson, Jr.(ekw) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Exemption from Fees, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |