Sinotechnix LLC v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Referred: | Roy S Payne |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00544 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 4:03 AM CDT |
Defendant
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO., LTD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sinotechnix LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Fri 08/02 10:35 AM
Answer Due Deadline Updated for SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. to 11/7/2024. (NKL) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/01 11:22 AM
ORDER granting11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/1/2024. (NKL) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Thu 08/01 11:23 AM
Answer Due Deadline Updated for SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO., LTD to 11/7/2024; SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. to 11/7/2024. (NKL) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/31 11:30 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO., LTD, SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD..(Smith, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/22 2:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sinotechnix LLC. SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO., LTD served on 7/19/2024. (Conroy, Patrick) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/22 2:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sinotechnix LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. served on 7/19/2024. (Conroy, Patrick) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/22 2:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sinotechnix LLC. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. served on 7/19/2024. (Conroy, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 07/18 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Griffin on behalf of Sinotechnix LLC (Griffin, Ryan) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 07/18 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Sinotechnix LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 07/18 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas William Kennedy, Jr on behalf of Sinotechnix LLC (Kennedy, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 8:48 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO., LTD, SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD..(NKL) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s) | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/18 7:58 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (NKL) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Thu 07/18 7:58 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Wed 07/17 7:04 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Sinotechnix LLC (Conroy, Patrick) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Wed 07/17 6:49 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Conroy, Patrick) |
|
1 | 1
41
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 6:44 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10245037.), filed by Sinotechnix LLC.(Conroy, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |