N.G. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04300 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rasier-CA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
N.G.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 6:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/18 11:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by N.G..(Anastasi, Sarah) Modified on 7/18/2024 (tn, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 9:37 AM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Thu 07/18 6:28 PM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED RE MDL 3084: N.G. v. Uber Technologies, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-04300-CRB cc: JPMDL (tn, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 07/17 4:17 PM
Proposed Summons. (Anastasi, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT short-form and demand for jury trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19631030.). Filed by N.G..(Anastasi, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |