18
|
|
18
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 08/29 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Janelle Sampana (Sampana, Janelle)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 08/27 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Ashley Yoshiye Nakai (Nakai, Ashley)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/19 11:24 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Enphase Energy, Inc... (Caplan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 08/14 2:20 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Enphase Energy, Inc. (Caplan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 08/14 2:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enphase Energy, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Enphase Energy, Inc.. (Caplan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 08/14 2:10 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Enphase Energy, Inc.. (Caplan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney
Wed 08/14 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Kristine Anne Forderer on behalf of Enphase Energy, Inc. (Forderer, Kristine)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney
Wed 08/14 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Matthew David Caplan on behalf of Enphase Energy, Inc. (Caplan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/07 4:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zola Electric International, Ltd.. Enphase Energy, Inc. served on 7/25/2024, answer due 8/15/2024. (Norton, William)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/31 6:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zola Electric International, Ltd... (Norton, William)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 07/24 11:36 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 11:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Enphase Energy, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/23 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Yoshiye Nakai (Nakai, Ashley)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/23 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle Sampana (Sampana, Janelle)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 9:38 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 07/17 5:36 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Zola Electric International, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Zola Electric Ltd. for Zola Electric International, Ltd.. And Certification of Conflicts and Interested Entities or Persons (Norton, William)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 07/17 5:29 PM
Proposed Summons. (Norton, William)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 5:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Enphase Energy, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19631495.). Filed by Zola Electric International, Ltd..(Norton, William)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|