Block 9 Upper MRU And Retail, LLC v. HSBC Bank USA, National Association
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sallie Kim |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04303 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | San Francisco County Superior Court, CGC-24-615331 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:13 AM PDT |
Counter-claimant
HSBC Bank USA, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Counter-defendant
Block 9 Upper MRU And Retail, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Block 9 Upper MRU And Retail, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 08/23 12:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Block 9 Upper MRU And Retail, LLC by HSBC Bank USA, National Association. (Donohue, Edward) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney
Thu 08/22 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Erin Kristina Lindberg on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association (Lindberg, Erin) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 08/07 3:17 PM
STIPULATION Second Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association. (Isola, Peter) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/01 1:31 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Block 9 Upper MRU And Retail, LLC.. (Buggy, Jamie) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/31 2:25 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by HSBC Bank USA, National Association.. (Donohue, Edward) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 07/25 1:23 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association. (Isola, Peter) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/18 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward F. Donohue (Donohue, Edward) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 07/18 12:15 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only via Zoom. (sfb, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
oth_sup
Request for Judicial Notice
Thu 07/18 10:36 AM
Request for Judicial Notice re2 Notice of Removal, filed byHSBC Bank USA, National Association. (Isola, Peter) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 10:32 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-24-615331. (). Filed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association.(Isola, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of HSBC Bank USA, N.A. In Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action To United States District Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332, 1441, 1446 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 07/18 9:10 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Document not properly linked. [err102]Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the documents are e-filed. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 1 New Case Filing Fee filed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association (smc, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
New Case Filing Fee
Wed 07/17 6:22 PM
FEE PAID (Filing fee$405,receipt number ACANDC-19631665). (Isola, Peter) |