Jones v. Home Depot Corp.
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew F Leitman |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11832 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 8:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
Home Depot Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Quintin Jones
13694 Mecca St
Detroit, MI 48227 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/22 12:42 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Home Depot Corp. served on 8/17/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (LGra) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 08/20 1:20 PM
ORDER denying plaintiff's7 Motion to amend complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DPer) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 08/20 12:21 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to sua sponte dismiss case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DPer) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/20 12:25 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re11 Report and Recommendation on Quintin Jones at 13694 Mecca St., Detroit, MI 48226. (DPer) |
||
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/20 1:23 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re12 Order on Quintin Jones at 13694 Mecca St., Detroit, MI 48226. (DPer) |
||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge*
Wed 08/14 9:28 AM
ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford and7 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya) |
|
9 | 9
service
Acknowledgment
Wed 08/14 9:18 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents for Home Depot Corp.. Documents mailed by USMS on 08/13/2024. (ABun) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/14 9:29 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re10 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Quintin Jones at 13694 Mecca St., Detroit, MI 48227. (HRya) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 08/07 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Home Depot Corp.* (JHea) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Leave to File
Wed 08/07 9:52 AM
MOTION for Leave to Amend Petition by Quintin Jones. (JHea) |
|
service
Service Documents Received
Tue 08/06 3:56 PM
Service Documents Received (SHic) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Directing Service by the US Marshal
Mon 07/22 12:15 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Mon 07/22 12:15 PM
ORDER Granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/22 12:17 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re6 Directing Service by the US Marshal,5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Quintin Jones at 13694 Mecca St., Detroit, MI 48227. (HRya) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Thu 07/18 8:19 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (SHic) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Wed 07/17 10:53 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Quintin Jones. (NAhm) |
|
1 | 1
2
pgs
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Wed 07/17 10:52 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Quintin Jones against Home Depot Corp. (NAhm) |