DAVIS v. JESTER et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Tilman E Self, III |
Referred: | Charles H Weigle |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00237 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer
Tue 07/23 12:22 PM
Acknowledgment of Electronic Case Transfer Out by District of Northern District of Georgia; Case Number 1:24-cv-03244. (ggs) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order of Transfer/Local Rule 3.4 Statement
Tue 07/23 10:21 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 7/23/2024. (vs) |
|
transfer
Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer
Tue 07/23 11:58 AM
Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 8/6/2024. (ggs) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/17 9:24 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (elp) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/17 9:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by WILLIE DAVIS.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(elp) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 07/17 9:23 AM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against CENTRAL STATE PRISON, GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF COLLECTIONS, TEKETA JESTER filed by WILLIE DAVIS(elp) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |