Coyote Logistics, LLC v. RGM Transport, LLC et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Victoria M Calvert |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03116 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 49:14705 Interstate Commerce Act/Carmack Amendment |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Gulinder Singh
600 NW Locust St
Issaquah, WA 98027 |
|
Defendant
RGM Transport, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Coyote Logistics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
30+
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/27 11:40 AM
STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 8/27/24. (vs) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 08/27 11:54 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gulinder Singh re8 Order. (vs) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 08/23 11:12 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Gulinder Singh. (jbu) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/20 2:20 PM
ORDER (by docket text only) granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Gulinder Singh Answer due 9/7/2024. Entered by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 24-3116 (vs) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 08/20 2:24 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gulinder Singh re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (vs) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/05 3:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Gulinder Singh. (jbu) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Return of Service Executed
Fri 07/19 10:41 AM
Return of Service Executed by Coyote Logistics, LLC. Gulinder Singh served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024. (Zottneck, Scott) |
|
4 | 4
service
Return of Service Executed
Fri 07/19 10:39 AM
Return of Service Executed by Coyote Logistics, LLC. RGM Transport, LLC served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024. (Zottneck, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 10:26 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Gulinder Singh. (pdt) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 10:23 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to RGM Transport, LLC. (pdt) (pdt) |
|
Att: 1 (7/17/2024) Summons RGM Transport, LLC | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Coyote Logistics, LLC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13573368) (pdt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Signed Verification to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Cargo Rate Confirmation, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Cargo Claim, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Check Payment, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Assignment of Claim, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Broker-Carrier Agreement, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |