DuVal v. Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Hala Y Jarbou |
Referred: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00734 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:49 AM EDT |
defendant
John Durrant
|
|
defendant
Fidelity National Information Services, Inc.
|
|
defendant
Sean Gordy
|
|
defendant
Denise Williams
|
|
plaintiff
Brian DuVal
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/30 6:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brian DuVal as to All Defendants (Gibson, Regan) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 1:22 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants John Durrant, Fidelity National Information Services, Inc., Sean Gordy, Denise Williams (slk) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Thu 07/18 1:14 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (slk) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/17 8:09 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Durrant, Fidelity National Information Services, Inc., Sean Gordy, Denise Williams filed by Brian DuVal (Gibson, Regan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Summons - FIS, | ||
Att: 3 Summons - Williams, | ||
Att: 4 Summons - Gordy, | ||
Att: 5 Summons - Durrant | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Wed 07/17 8:15 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Brian DuVal in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7430721 (Gibson, Regan) |