Smith v. EMA Risk Services Mohave Transportation Insurance Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Bruce Howe Hendricks |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-03971 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Cherokee County Court of Common Pleas, 2024-CP-11-00384 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:18 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
EMA Risk Services Mohave Transportation Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
James Smith
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EMA Risk Services Mohave Transportation Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Smith
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Quintin Deandre Mickerson
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Vault Enterprises, LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
EMA Risk Services Mohave Transportation Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Fri 08/23 3:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. Quintin Deandre Mickerson served on 8/15/2024, answer due 9/5/2024.(Kennedy, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - proof of service on Quintin Deandre Mickerson | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Fri 08/23 3:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. Vault Enterprises, LLC served on 7/26/2024, answer due 8/16/2024.(Kennedy, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - proof of service on Defendant Vault Enterprises, LLC | ||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Mediation Order
Mon 08/19 12:49 PM
MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 2/14/2025. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/19/24. (alew) |
|
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/19 12:48 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/9/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/23/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 9/23/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/15/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/14/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/16/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/16/2024, Discovery due by 2/14/2025, Mediation Due by 2/14/2025, Motions due by 3/17/2025, Bench Trial Deadline 6/16/2025. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/19/24. (alew) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 07/25 2:48 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James Smith.(Poliakoff, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 2:42 PM
Summons on a Third-Party Complaint Issued as to Quintin Deandre Mickerson, Vault Enterprises, LLC.(alew) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Vault Enterprises LLC | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim
Tue 07/23 2:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Quintin Deandre Mickerson, Vault Enterprises, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against James Smith by EMA Risk Services Mohave Transportation Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America.(Kennedy, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Policy (Part 1), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Policy (Part 2), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Policy (Part 3), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Policy (Part 4), | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice Other
Wed 07/17 1:20 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal. (alew) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 07/17 1:19 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by EMA Risk Services Mohave Transportation Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America.(alew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/17 1:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cherokee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024-CP 11-00384 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11878695), filed by EMA Risk Services Mohave Transportation Insurance Company, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America.(alew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents |