Chocon-Gomez v. King
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine M Menendez |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02737 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Petitioner
Franklin Alizandro Chocon-Gomez
|
|
Respondent
Mark King
|
GPO
Jul 23 2024
ORDER granting 3 Motion to Expedite. Please see Order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/23/2024.(Written Opinion) (EPD) |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter to Clerk's Office
Tue 09/03 3:25 PM
LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Franklin Chacon-Gomez.(ACH) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Exhibit/Exhibit List (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Mon 08/12 11:08 AM
EXHIBIT re13 Response filed by Franklin Alizandro Chocon-Gomez.(ACH) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Response (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Mon 08/12 11:07 AM
RESPONSE by Franklin Alizandro Chocon-Gomez re9 Response to Habeas Petition.(ACH) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/08 8:09 AM
NOTICE of Intent to File a Timely Reply to Respondent's Opposition by Franklin Alizandro Chocon-Gomez(BTX) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/30 2:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark King re9 Response to Habeas Petition,10 Declaration (Hoskins, Adam) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Declaration
Tue 07/30 2:57 PM
DECLARATION of Jessica Delgado re9 Response to Habeas Petition by Mark King .(Hoskins, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
9 | 9
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Tue 07/30 2:55 PM
RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mark King. (Hoskins, Adam) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Brief (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Mon 07/29 2:25 PM
PETITIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,.(ACH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 7, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 8-12, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/29 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin Alizandro Chocon-Gomez.(ACH) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Receipt
Mon 07/29 8:30 AM
RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000751 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Franklin Alizandro Chocon-Gomez. (jam) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/25 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Hoskins on behalf of Mark King.(Hoskins, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 07/23 1:14 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Expedite. Please see Order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/23/2024.(Written Opinion) (EPD) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter from Clerk's Office re: No Fee or IFP enclosing AO 239
Wed 07/17 11:01 AM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Franklin Alizandro Chocon-Gomez (jam) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/17 11:03 AM
MOTION TO EXPEDITE PROCEEDINGS AND SUGGESTED BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Franklin Alizandro Chocon-Gomez.(jam) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 07/17 11:01 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Franklin Alizandro Chocon-Gomez. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 5th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Envelope |