Cerroni et al v. Morris et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | David Barlow |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00495 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:53 AM MDT |
Appellant
Daniel Cerroni
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
Kriselle Wilkinson
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Curt W Morris
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Tamara S Morris
|
Represented By
|
Notice Party
Bankruptcy Clerk's Office
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 09/03 11:37 AM
ORDER: granting 4 Motion to Supplement Record, granting 6 Motion to Supplement Record. The record shall be supplemented with a copy of Appellants' proof of claim and the order confirming Appellees' Chapter 13 plan; and granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellants' brief. Brief is extended to 09/27/2024. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 09/03/2024. (kpf) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 08/30 1:03 PM
Stipulated RESPONSE to Motion re6 Second MOTION Supplement the Record and Memorandum in Support ,4 MOTION Motion to Supplement Record and Memorandum in Support ,5 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Appellants' brief and Memorandum in Support filed by Appellant Daniel Cerroni.(Laird, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/29 4:10 PM
Second MOTION Supplement the Record and Memorandum in Support filed by Appellant Daniel Cerroni. (Laird, Kurt) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/29 2:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to file Appellants' brief and Memorandum in Support filed by Appellant Daniel Cerroni. (Laird, Kurt) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/29 2:16 PM
MOTION Motion to Supplement Record and Memorandum in Support filed by Appellant Daniel Cerroni. (Laird, Kurt) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
appeal
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability
Mon 08/05 4:17 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability per notification from the US Bankruptcy Court, District of Utah re Bankruptcy case 21-24037 The Notice of Appeal Filing Fee has been Paid in Full. The Appellant has Filed a Designation of Record. The Appellee has NOT Filed a Designation of Record. All Requested Transcripts have been Filed. (nl) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Counsel re Bankruptcy Appeal
Wed 07/17 9:34 AM
Notice to Counsel Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal, e-mailed or mailed to Appellants Daniel Cerroni, Kriselle Wilkinson, Appellees Curt W Morris, Tamara S Morris. (sg) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Wed 07/17 9:26 AM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 21-24037 No filing fee required. NOTE TO COUNSEL : Briefs and other subsequent documents filed with the court should contain references to bankruptcy documents using document numbers and dates. filed by Kriselle Wilkinson, Daniel Cerroni. Assigned to Judge David Barlow (sg) |
|
Att: 1 Order Denying Motion for Relief of Stay, | ||
Att: 2 Docket Sheet |