Gabriel #358293 v. Nerio et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Cindy K Jorgenson |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00356 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 09/05 10:01 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed July 17, 2024, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's order. (SCA) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment
Wed 07/17 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SCA) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/17 4:58 PM
NOTICE re: re: FRCiv 5.2 Privacy Protection Guidelines. (SCA) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/17 4:57 PM
NOTICE re: This case is subject to General Order 23-19, which supersedes General Order 14-17. Please see attached Order and Instructions.(SCA) |
|
Att: 1 E-Filing Instructions | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment
Wed 07/17 4:46 PM
*Refiled at doc8 ---NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SCA) (SCA). *Modified on 7/17/2024 (SCA) |
|
Att: 1 (7/17/2024) Instructions | ||
1 | 1
23
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/17 4:39 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff Gabriel must proceed independently from this point forward. All further pleadings, motions or other papers submitted for filing by Plaintiff must be signed by Plaintiff, or they will be stricken. The Clerk of Court must file a copy of the Complaint (Doc. 1), the Statement of Facts (Doc. 2), and Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 4) in Plaintiff Gabriel's new action. The rulings in this Order shall apply in Plaintiff's new action. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff Gabriel, in his individual action, not this action, must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $55.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff Gabriel fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $55.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis in his individual action within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of Plaintiffs action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff Gabriel, in his individual action, not this action, has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 7/17/2024. (See attached Order for complete information.)(SCA) |