Spokane Public Schools v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04266 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
|
|
Defendant
TikTok, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok, LLC
|
|
Defendant
TikTok, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Snap, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Meta Payments Inc.
Corporation Service Company 1201 Hayes Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
|
Defendant
Google LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Technologies, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
ByteDance Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
ByteDance Inc. 1920 Olympic Blvd
Santa Monica, CA 90404 |
|
Defendant
Alphabet Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Spokane Public Schools
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/29 10:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spokane Public Schools. All Defendants.(Shinoff, William) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., ByteDance Inc., ByteDance Ltd., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Google LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Payments Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc., TikTok, Inc., TikTok, LLC, TikTok, Ltd., YouTube, LLC. (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 07/17 10:37 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/17 10:42 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Spokane Public Schools v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-04266-YGR cc: JPMDL (far, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Shinoff, William) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19622958.). Filed by Spokane Public Schools.(Shinoff, William) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |