Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Estate of Laurent Vallee, et al.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Donna M Ryu |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04272 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Estate of Laurent Vallee
|
|
Defendant
Andrew Sproul
|
|
Defendant
Brendan Sproul
|
|
Defendant
Casey Sproul
|
|
Defendant
Patrick Sproul
|
|
Plaintiff
Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/19 8:27 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company.. (Selvin, Gary) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 07/19 8:18 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . FILING PARTY NOT IDENTIFIED ON THE FORM [err102] Re:7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Please re-file in its entirety. Please indicate the party on the "Counsel For" line. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/17 2:46 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company.. (Selvin, Gary) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 07/17 2:45 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange for Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Selvin, Gary) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 07/17 10:29 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2024, 01:30 PM in Oakland - via Zoom. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 10:16 AM
Summons Issued as to Estate of Laurent Vallee, Andrew Sproul, Brendan Sproul, Casey Sproul, Patrick Sproul. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/30/2024. (cjl, COURT STAFF) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Selvin, Gary) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19623710.). Filed by Farmers Direct Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Selvin, Gary) Modified on 7/17/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |