Chen Zhao, et al v. Ang Jin
Original Case: 1:19-cv-06153
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02218 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 315 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 18, 2024 5:06 AM CDT |
Appellant
ANG JIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BOEING COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHEN ZHAO, as personal representatives of the ESTATE OF YETAO JIN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/18/2024 5:06 AM CDT |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Ang Jin by 07/22/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 07/30/2024. Fee or IFP forms due on 07/30/2024 for Appellant Ang Jin. [1] [7394071] 24-2218 (ER) [Entered: 07/17/2024 12:26 PM] | |
Att: 1 8 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Fee Notice |