13
|
|
13
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 08/29 2:53 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Yellow Tag Auctions, LLC..(Ballard, Wade)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/27 3:49 PM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/29/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 8/29/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/21/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/23/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/22/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/22/2025, Discovery due by 3/18/2025, Mediation Due by 4/2/2025, Motions due by 4/22/2025, other dead lines as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/27/24. (pbri, )
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 08/27 12:38 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Kendell Reason.(Arnold, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
discov
Rule 26 Discovery Plan
Tue 08/27 12:04 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Yellow Tag Auctions, LLC..(Ballard, Wade)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 08/27 12:02 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Yellow Tag Auctions, LLC..(Ballard, Wade)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/25 10:13 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/15/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/29/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 8/29/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/19/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/21/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/20/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/20/2024, Discovery due by 1/21/2025, Mediation Due by 2/4/2025, Motions due by 2/25/2025, other deadlines as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/25/24. (pbri, )
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/23 12:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Yellow Tag Auctions, LLC..(Ballard, Wade)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 07/19 8:38 AM
Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kendell Reason.(Arnold, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
notice
Notice Other
Thu 07/18 8:01 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories (including section H) are due fourteen (14) days after removal. Notice of Removals: Federal Rule 81.C.2. A defendant who did not answer before removal must answer or present other defenses or objections under these rules within the longest of these periods: (C) seven (7) days after the notice of removal is filed. (pbri, )
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 07/18 8:00 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Yellow Tag Auctions, LLC.(pbri, )
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 7:58 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024CP4202467. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11882082), filed by Yellow Tag Auctions, LLC.(pbri, )
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
State Court Documents,
|
| |
Att: 2
Certificate of Service
|